Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Deeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0107 /CH0093
Title
Real Property - Residential Property Foreclosure Procedures
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0250 (SB0374)
Title
Real Property - Maryland Condominium Act - Priority of Liens
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0264
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Calculation of Credit for Dwelling Purchased by First-Time Homebuyer
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0709 (SB0612)
Title
Homeowners Associations - Powers, Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, and Rules
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0993 /CH0554 (SB0710/CH0555)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0058 /CH0130
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Board of Trustees and Elimination of District Agreements
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0374 (HB0250)
Title
Real Property - Maryland Condominium Act - Priority of Liens
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0612 (HB0709)
Title
Homeowners Associations - Powers, Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, and Rules
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0710 /CH0555 (HB0993/CH0554)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1048
Title
Real Property – Recorded Covenants – Substantially Changed Circumstances
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0107 /CH0093 Real Property - Residential Property Foreclosure Procedures Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Environment and Transportation
2/05/2019 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0250 (SB0374) Real Property - Maryland Condominium Act - Priority of Liens Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0264 Homestead Property Tax Credit - Calculation of Credit for Dwelling Purchased by First-Time Homebuyer Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0709 (SB0612) Homeowners Associations - Powers, Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, and Rules Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0993 /CH0554 (SB0710/CH0555) Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0058 /CH0130 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Board of Trustees and Elimination of District Agreements Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2019 - 4:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0374 (HB0250) Real Property - Maryland Condominium Act - Priority of Liens Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0612 (HB0709) Homeowners Associations - Powers, Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, and Rules Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0710 /CH0555 (HB0993/CH0554) Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1048 Real Property – Recorded Covenants – Substantially Changed Circumstances Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:22 PM