Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Demographics -see also- Census; Data

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0016 /CH0554
Title
Community Colleges - Near Completers and Maryland Community College Promise Scholarships
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0292
Title
Health Insurance - Group Health Benefit Plans - Disclosure of Information
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0462
Title
Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Public School System - Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0941 /CH0396
Title
Child Care Subsidy Program – Unemployment – Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1415 /CH0361 (SB1092)
Title
Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1524 (SB1134)
Title
Juvenile Justice Coordinating Council
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1530
Title
Education – Identification of Students With Traumatic Brain Injury – Study and Report
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1560
Title
Baltimore City Department of Public Works - Water and Sewer Bill Dispute Process, Billing Program Review, and Report
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1603 (SB1109)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board - Data Collection on Race and Ethnicity
Sponsor
Delegate Sanchez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1654
Title
Commercial Law - Internet Privacy and Net Neutrality
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1819 /CH0566 (SB0615/CH0567)
Title
Higher Education – Cyber Warrior Diversity Program – Established
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0978 /CH0695 (HB1216/CH0694)
Title
Career Preparation Expansion Act
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1109 (HB1603)
Title
Task Force to Standardize Data Collection on Race and Ethnicity
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0016 /CH0554 Community Colleges - Near Completers and Maryland Community College Promise Scholarships Delegate Turner 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554
Ways and Means
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB0292 Health Insurance - Group Health Benefit Plans - Disclosure of Information Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0462 Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Public School System - Reports Delegate Ali 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0941 /CH0396 Child Care Subsidy Program – Unemployment – Eligibility Delegate Queen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1415 /CH0361 (SB1092) Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Ways and Means
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB1524 (SB1134) Juvenile Justice Coordinating Council Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Judiciary
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1530 Education – Identification of Students With Traumatic Brain Injury – Study and Report Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
3/09/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1560 Baltimore City Department of Public Works - Water and Sewer Bill Dispute Process, Billing Program Review, and Report Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1603 (SB1109) Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board - Data Collection on Race and Ethnicity Delegate Sanchez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1654 Commercial Law - Internet Privacy and Net Neutrality Delegate Frick 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Economic Matters
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1819 /CH0566 (SB0615/CH0567) Higher Education – Cyber Warrior Diversity Program – Established Delegate Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 566
Appropriations
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0978 /CH0695 (HB1216/CH0694) Career Preparation Expansion Act Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 695
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
SB1109 (HB1603) Task Force to Standardize Data Collection on Race and Ethnicity Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM