Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Dental Hygienists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0100 /CH0381
Title
Dental Hygienists - Practice in Long-Term Care Facilities - Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0101 /CH0382
Title
Dental Hygienists - Nitrous Oxide - Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0657 /CH0416
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Grounds for Discipline
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0100 /CH0381 Dental Hygienists - Practice in Long-Term Care Facilities - Repeal of Termination Date Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381
Health and Government Operations
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0101 /CH0382 Dental Hygienists - Nitrous Oxide - Repeal of Termination Date Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Health and Government Operations
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0657 /CH0416 State Board of Dental Examiners - Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Grounds for Discipline Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Health and Government Operations
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM