Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Dental Hygienists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0727 (SB0644)
Title
Dental Hygienist - Scope of Practice - Authority to Practice Under General Supervision of Licensed Dentist
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1022
Title
Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1158
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Comprehensive Dental Benefits for Adults - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1214 (SB1013)
Title
Health Occupations - Dental Therapists - Licensure
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1292
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1584 (SB1124)
Title
Maryland Dentistry Act - Scope of Practice and Penalties for Violations
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0644 (HB0727)
Title
Dental Hygienist - Scope of Practice - Authority to Practice Under General Supervision of Licensed Dentist
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1013 (HB1214)
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene and Maryland Higher Education Commission - Workgroup to Examine the Need for Dental Therapy
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1124 (HB1584)
Title
Maryland Dentistry Act - Scope of Practice and Penalties for Violations
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0727 (SB0644) Dental Hygienist - Scope of Practice - Authority to Practice Under General Supervision of Licensed Dentist Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1022 Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders Delegate West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1158 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Comprehensive Dental Benefits for Adults - Authorization Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1214 (SB1013) Health Occupations - Dental Therapists - Licensure Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 PM
HB1292 State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 PM
HB1584 (SB1124) Maryland Dentistry Act - Scope of Practice and Penalties for Violations Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0644 (HB0727) Dental Hygienist - Scope of Practice - Authority to Practice Under General Supervision of Licensed Dentist Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1013 (HB1214) Department of Health and Mental Hygiene and Maryland Higher Education Commission - Workgroup to Examine the Need for Dental Therapy Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1124 (HB1584) Maryland Dentistry Act - Scope of Practice and Penalties for Violations Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM