Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Dental Hygienists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0656 (SB0545)
Title
Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications (The Christopher King Access to Treatment Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0939 /CH0379 (SB0174/CH0380)
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Practice of Dentistry - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0947 /CH0385 (SB0169/CH0386)
Title
Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0169 /CH0386 (HB0947/CH0385)
Title
Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0174 /CH0380 (HB0939/CH0379)
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Practice of Dentistry - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0511
Title
Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0656 (SB0545) Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications (The Christopher King Access to Treatment Act) Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Finance
HB0939 /CH0379 (SB0174/CH0380) State Board of Dental Examiners - Practice of Dentistry - Revisions Delegate Cullison 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 379
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0947 /CH0385 (SB0169/CH0386) Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders Delegate Cullison 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 385
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Judicial Proceedings
SB0169 /CH0386 (HB0947/CH0385) Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 386
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
SB0174 /CH0380 (HB0939/CH0379) State Board of Dental Examiners - Practice of Dentistry - Revisions Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 380
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0511 Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 3:30 PM