Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Dentists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0070 (SB1256)
Title
Maryland Dentistry Act - Scope of Practice and Penalties for Violations
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0438
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0652
Title
Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0800 /CH0710 (SB0934/CH0711)
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Licensure - Faculty Members at the University of Maryland School of Dentistry
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0863 /CH0483 (SB0698)
Title
State Board of Nursing - Advanced Practice Registered Nurses - Certification and Practice
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0879 (SB0544)
Title
Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1512
Title
Health Insurance - Dental Preventive Care - Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1726
Title
Maryland Dentistry Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1782 /CH0037
Title
Health Insurance - Individual Market Stabilization (Maryland Health Care Access Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0284 /CH0621
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Coverage for Adults – Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0387 /CH0038
Title
Health Insurance – Individual Market Stabilization (Maryland Health Care Access Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 /CH0711 (HB0800/CH0710)
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Licensure - Faculty Members at the University of Maryland School of Dentistry
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1256 (HB0070)
Title
Maryland Dentistry Act - Scope of Practice and Penalties for Violations
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0070 (SB1256) Maryland Dentistry Act - Scope of Practice and Penalties for Violations Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0438 State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0652 Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders Delegate West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0800 /CH0710 (SB0934/CH0711) State Board of Dental Examiners - Licensure - Faculty Members at the University of Maryland School of Dentistry Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 710
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0863 /CH0483 (SB0698) State Board of Nursing - Advanced Practice Registered Nurses - Certification and Practice Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0879 (SB0544) Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1512 Health Insurance - Dental Preventive Care - Coverage Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1726 Maryland Dentistry Act - Revisions Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1782 /CH0037 Health Insurance - Individual Market Stabilization (Maryland Health Care Access Act of 2018) Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0284 /CH0621 Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Coverage for Adults – Pilot Program Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 621
Finance
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0387 /CH0038 Health Insurance – Individual Market Stabilization (Maryland Health Care Access Act of 2018) Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0934 /CH0711 (HB0800/CH0710) State Board of Dental Examiners - Licensure - Faculty Members at the University of Maryland School of Dentistry Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 711
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1256 (HB0070) Maryland Dentistry Act - Scope of Practice and Penalties for Violations Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM