Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Developmental Disabilities -see also- Vulnerable Adults

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0094
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Accidental Disability Retirement Application
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0140
Title
Special Education - Administrative Proceedings and Judicial Actions - Attorney's and Expert Witness Fees and Related Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0155 /CH0385 (SB0164/CH0386)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Capital and Grant Programs - State Grants
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0734 /CH0023 (SB0689/CH0024)
Title
Criminal Law - Labor Trafficking (Anti-Exploitation Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0937
Title
Family Law - Child Support - Eligibility of a Child Who Has Attained the Age of 18 Years
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0975 (SB0907)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1197
Title
Task Force on Adults With Autism Spectrum Disorder
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1224
Title
County Boards of Education - Computer Science Courses
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1240 (SB0730)
Title
State Personnel – Merit Pay
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1275
Title
Office of Administrative Hearings - Administrative Law Judges - Special Education Law Training
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1332 (SB0783)
Title
Public Health – Human Papillomavirus Vaccine – Information and Informed Consent (Christina’s Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1407 /CH0016 (SB1040)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2019
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1420 /CH0390
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Services for Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Fee-for-Service Payment Pilot Program
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0164 /CH0386 (HB0155/CH0385)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Capital and Grant Programs - State Grants
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0280 /CH0011 (HB0166/CH0010)
Title
Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0295
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0506
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Services - Needs Assessment Study
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0689 /CH0024 (HB0734/CH0023)
Title
Criminal Law - Labor Trafficking (Anti-Exploitation Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0730 (HB1240)
Title
State Personnel - Maryland Department of Health - Pay Rates
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0783 (HB1332)
Title
Public Health - Human Papillomavirus Vaccine - Information and Informed Consent
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0907 (HB0975)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1016
Title
Education - Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1040 (HB1407/CH0016)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2019
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0094 State Retirement and Pension System - Accidental Disability Retirement Application Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0140 Special Education - Administrative Proceedings and Judicial Actions - Attorney's and Expert Witness Fees and Related Costs Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0155 /CH0385 (SB0164/CH0386) Maryland Department of Health - Capital and Grant Programs - State Grants Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 385
Appropriations
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0734 /CH0023 (SB0689/CH0024) Criminal Law - Labor Trafficking (Anti-Exploitation Act of 2019) Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 23
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0937 Family Law - Child Support - Eligibility of a Child Who Has Attained the Age of 18 Years Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0975 (SB0907) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1197 Task Force on Adults With Autism Spectrum Disorder Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB1224 County Boards of Education - Computer Science Courses Delegate Rose 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1240 (SB0730) State Personnel – Merit Pay Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1275 Office of Administrative Hearings - Administrative Law Judges - Special Education Law Training Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/01/2019 - 11:30 AM
HB1332 (SB0783) Public Health – Human Papillomavirus Vaccine – Information and Informed Consent (Christina’s Law) Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1407 /CH0016 (SB1040) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2019 Chair, Appropriations Committee 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 16
Appropriations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1420 /CH0390 Maryland Department of Health - Services for Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Fee-for-Service Payment Pilot Program Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0164 /CH0386 (HB0155/CH0385) Maryland Department of Health - Capital and Grant Programs - State Grants President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Appropriations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0280 /CH0011 (HB0166/CH0010) Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen) Senator McCray 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 11
Finance
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0295 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0506 Maryland Department of Health - Mental Health and Substance Use Disorder Services - Needs Assessment Study Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0689 /CH0024 (HB0734/CH0023) Criminal Law - Labor Trafficking (Anti-Exploitation Act of 2019) Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 24
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0730 (HB1240) State Personnel - Maryland Department of Health - Pay Rates Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0783 (HB1332) Public Health - Human Papillomavirus Vaccine - Information and Informed Consent Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0907 (HB0975) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1016 Education - Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1040 (HB1407/CH0016) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2019 Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:22 PM