Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Development Fees and Taxes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0449 /CH0657 (SB0451/CH0658)
Title
Baltimore County – Development Impact Fees – Authorization and Use of Funds
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0451 /CH0658 (HB0449/CH0657)
Title
Baltimore County – Development Impact Fees – Authorization and Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0581 /CH0211 (HB1260)
Title
Economic, Housing, and Community Development – Opportunity Zone Incentives
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0449 /CH0657 (SB0451/CH0658) Baltimore County – Development Impact Fees – Authorization and Use of Funds Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 657
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0451 /CH0658 (HB0449/CH0657) Baltimore County – Development Impact Fees – Authorization and Use of Funds Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0581 /CH0211 (HB1260) Economic, Housing, and Community Development – Opportunity Zone Incentives Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2019 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:22 PM