Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Disabilities, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0747
Title
Election Law – Links to Online Voter Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1384 /CH0741 (SB0677/CH0742)
Title
Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0368
Title
Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Security Screening Checkpoint - Charitable Donations
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0677 /CH0742 (HB1384/CH0741)
Title
Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0747 Election Law – Links to Online Voter Registration Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1384 /CH0741 (SB0677/CH0742) Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents Delegate Bhandari 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 741
Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0368 Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Security Screening Checkpoint - Charitable Donations Senator West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0677 /CH0742 (HB1384/CH0741) Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 742
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:22 PM