Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Disabilities, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0847 /CH0341
Title
State Coordinator for Autism Strategy and Advisory Stakeholder Group on Autism-Related Needs
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1003 (SB0851/CH0586)
Title
Human Services - Department of Disabilities - Accessibility Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0610
Title
Community Colleges - Supplemental Services and Supports for Students With Disabilities Grant Program
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0851 /CH0586 (HB1003)
Title
Human Services – Department of Disabilities – Accessibility Programs
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0918
Title
Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0847 /CH0341 State Coordinator for Autism Strategy and Advisory Stakeholder Group on Autism-Related Needs Delegate Guyton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 341
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1003 (SB0851/CH0586) Human Services - Department of Disabilities - Accessibility Programs Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0610 Community Colleges - Supplemental Services and Supports for Students With Disabilities Grant Program Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0851 /CH0586 (HB1003) Human Services – Department of Disabilities – Accessibility Programs Senator Kagan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 586
Finance
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0918 Human Services - Trauma-Informed Care - Commission and Training Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2020 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:26 PM