Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

District of Columbia

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0308 (SB0338/CH0117)
Title
Public Safety - Statewide Interoperability Radio Control Board - Established
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0005
Title
Changing the Name of the Washington, D.C., Professional Football Team
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0338 /CH0117 (HB0308)
Title
Public Safety - Statewide Interoperability Radio Control Board - Established
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0308 (SB0338/CH0117) Public Safety - Statewide Interoperability Radio Control Board - Established Speaker 3 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HJ0005 Changing the Name of the Washington, D.C., Professional Football Team Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0338 /CH0117 (HB0308) Public Safety - Statewide Interoperability Radio Control Board - Established President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM