Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

District of Columbia

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0119 /CH0003
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Washington Metrorail Safety Commission - Establishment and Compact
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0285 /CH0352 (SB0265/CH0351)
Title
Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Membership Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0265 /CH0351 (HB0285/CH0352)
Title
Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Membership Act
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0119 /CH0003 Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Washington Metrorail Safety Commission - Establishment and Compact Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2017 - 1:15 PM
Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0285 /CH0352 (SB0265/CH0351) Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Membership Act Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0265 /CH0351 (HB0285/CH0352) Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Membership Act Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Finance
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM