Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

District of Columbia

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0372 /CH0352 (SB0277/CH0351)
Title
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0596 (SB0234/CH0470)
Title
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0664 (SB0543)
Title
Labor and Employment - Payment of the Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1089 (SB0894)
Title
Metro Oversight Enhancement Act
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1522
Title
Handgun Permits - Universal Recognition
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0050
Title
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel – Eligibility
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0234 /CH0470 (HB0596)
Title
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0277 /CH0351 (HB0372/CH0352)
Title
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0543 (HB0664)
Title
Labor and Employment - Payment of the Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0894 (HB1089)
Title
Metro Oversight Enhancement Act
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0372 /CH0352 (SB0277/CH0351) Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0596 (SB0234/CH0470) Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0664 (SB0543) Labor and Employment - Payment of the Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen) Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1089 (SB0894) Metro Oversight Enhancement Act Delegate Barron 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1522 Handgun Permits - Universal Recognition Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0050 Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel – Eligibility Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/31/2018 - 2:30 PM
SB0234 /CH0470 (HB0596) Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0277 /CH0351 (HB0372/CH0352) Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2018 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0543 (HB0664) Labor and Employment - Payment of the Minimum Wage Required (Fight for Fifteen) Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0894 (HB1089) Metro Oversight Enhancement Act Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM