Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

District of Columbia

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0166 /CH0010 (SB0280/CH0011)
Title
Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0697 /CH0418 (SB0868/CH0417)
Title
Health Insurance – Consumer Protections and Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1065 /CH0284 (SB0695)
Title
Maryland Commercial Receivership Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1280 /CH0563
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Collective Bargaining - Technical Unit MC/PG 114-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1413 (SB1030/CH0771)
Title
The Blueprint for Maryland's Future
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0007
Title
United States of America - District of Columbia - Statehood
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0280 /CH0011 (HB0166/CH0010)
Title
Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0868 /CH0417 (HB0697/CH0418)
Title
Health Insurance – Consumer Protections and Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1030 /CH0771 (HB1413)
Title
The Blueprint for Maryland’s Future
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0166 /CH0010 (SB0280/CH0011) Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen) Delegate Fennell 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 10
Economic Matters
2/08/2019 - 12:30 PM
Finance
HB0697 /CH0418 (SB0868/CH0417) Health Insurance – Consumer Protections and Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1065 /CH0284 (SB0695) Maryland Commercial Receivership Act Delegate Carey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284
Economic Matters
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1280 /CH0563 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Collective Bargaining - Technical Unit MC/PG 114-19 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563
Appropriations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1413 (SB1030/CH0771) The Blueprint for Maryland's Future Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) and Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Ways and Means
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HJ0007 United States of America - District of Columbia - Statehood Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0280 /CH0011 (HB0166/CH0010) Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen) Senator McCray 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 11
Finance
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0868 /CH0417 (HB0697/CH0418) Health Insurance – Consumer Protections and Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 417
Finance
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1030 /CH0771 (HB1413) The Blueprint for Maryland’s Future President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 771
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2019 - 4:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:22 PM