Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

District of Columbia

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0047 (SB0327)
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Qualification License - Training Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162 /CH0089
Title
Transportation - Potomac River Bridges Towing Compact - Inclusion of Additional Bridges
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0402 /CH0193
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Sovereign Immunity - Employee Whistleblower Protection
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1236
Title
Transit - Maryland Area Regional Commuter Train - Expansion of Service
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1526
Title
Transportation Carbon Reduction Fund – Establishment (Transportation Carbon Fund Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0008
Title
United States of America - District of Columbia - Statehood
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0327 (HB0047)
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Qualification License - Training Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0047 (SB0327) Public Safety - Handgun Qualification License - Training Exemption Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/22/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0162 /CH0089 Transportation - Potomac River Bridges Towing Compact - Inclusion of Additional Bridges Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 89
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0402 /CH0193 Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Sovereign Immunity - Employee Whistleblower Protection Delegate Barron 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 193
Appropriations
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/16/2020 - 10:00 AM
HB1236 Transit - Maryland Area Regional Commuter Train - Expansion of Service Delegate Solomon 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1526 Transportation Carbon Reduction Fund – Establishment (Transportation Carbon Fund Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HJ0008 United States of America - District of Columbia - Statehood Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/02/2020 - 2:00 PM
SB0327 (HB0047) Public Safety - Handgun Qualification License - Training Exemption Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/6/2020 1:26 PM