Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Divorce -see also- Annulment

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0165 /CH0226
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Limited Divorce
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0220 (SB0273)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0625 (SB0428)
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Revocable Trusts - Partial Revocation by Divorce or Annulment
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1185 /CH0473
Title
Family Law - Application for Divorce - Residency Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273 (HB0220)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0428 (HB0625)
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Revocable Trusts - Partial Revocation by Divorce or Annulment
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0472 /CH0353
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Divorce - Mutual Consent
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0556 /CH0363
Title
Health Insurance - Selection of State Benchmark Plan and Required Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0165 /CH0226 Family Law - Grounds for Limited Divorce Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Judiciary
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0220 (SB0273) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0625 (SB0428) Maryland Trust Act - Revocable Trusts - Partial Revocation by Divorce or Annulment Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1185 /CH0473 Family Law - Application for Divorce - Residency Requirement Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Judiciary
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0273 (HB0220) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0428 (HB0625) Maryland Trust Act - Revocable Trusts - Partial Revocation by Divorce or Annulment Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0472 /CH0353 Family Law - Grounds for Divorce - Mutual Consent Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0556 /CH0363 Health Insurance - Selection of State Benchmark Plan and Required Conformity With Federal Law Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM