Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Divorce -see also- Annulment

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0274 /CH0380
Title
Family Law - Divorce - Corroboration of Testimony
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0310
Title
Divorce - Separation Agreement - Corroboration of Testimony
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0541 /CH0270 (SB0451)
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Revocable Trust - Partial Revocation by Divorce or Annulment
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1120
Title
Family Law - Automatic Injunction
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1183
Title
Family Law - Divorce - Restoration of Former Name
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1229 (SB0913)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0358
Title
Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Parties With Minor Children
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0359 /CH0379
Title
Family Law - Divorce - Corroboration of Testimony
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0451 (HB0541/CH0270)
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Revocable Trust - Partial Revocation by Divorce or Annulment
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0913 (HB1229)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0274 /CH0380 Family Law - Divorce - Corroboration of Testimony Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Judiciary
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0310 Divorce - Separation Agreement - Corroboration of Testimony Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0541 /CH0270 (SB0451) Maryland Trust Act - Revocable Trust - Partial Revocation by Divorce or Annulment Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1120 Family Law - Automatic Injunction Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1183 Family Law - Divorce - Restoration of Former Name Delegate Angel 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1229 (SB0913) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0358 Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Parties With Minor Children Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0359 /CH0379 Family Law - Divorce - Corroboration of Testimony Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 379
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0451 (HB0541/CH0270) Maryland Trust Act - Revocable Trust - Partial Revocation by Divorce or Annulment Senator Lee 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0913 (HB1229) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM