Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Divorce -see also- Annulment

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0099 /CH0435 (SB0192)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0218 /CH0232 (SB0147/CH0231)
Title
Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Forfeiture or Waiver of Right of Disposition
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0402
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0665 (SB0811)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0147 /CH0231 (HB0218/CH0232)
Title
Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Forfeiture or Waiver of Right of Disposition
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0192 (HB0099/CH0435)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0811 (HB0665)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0099 /CH0435 (SB0192) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2019 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0218 /CH0232 (SB0147/CH0231) Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Forfeiture or Waiver of Right of Disposition Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2019 - 2:00 PM
Finance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0402 Family Law - Grounds for Divorce Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0665 (SB0811) Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0147 /CH0231 (HB0218/CH0232) Public Health - Disposition of Remains - Forfeiture or Waiver of Right of Disposition Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Finance
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0192 (HB0099/CH0435) Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse Senator Kelley 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0811 (HB0665) Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:22 PM