Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Dogs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0108 /CH0293 (SB0104/CH0292)
Title
St. Mary's County - Regulation of Animals - Dogs
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0187 /CH0290 (SB0103/CH0291)
Title
St. Mary's County - Foxes and Hounds - Repeal of Provisions
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0432 (SB0366)
Title
Public Health - Rabies Vaccination Information - Submission to Local Agencies and Use for Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0528 (SB0420)
Title
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0626 /CH0409
Title
Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Standards of Care and Protocol Implementation and Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0781 /CH0343
Title
Retail Pet Stores - Animal Seller, Dog Cage Signs, and Records - Requirement Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243
Title
Income Tax Credit - Veterinary Services for Adopted Government Service Dogs
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0077 /CH0196
Title
Anne Arundel County and Harford County - Courthouse Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0103 /CH0291 (HB0187/CH0290)
Title
St. Mary's County - Foxes and Hounds - Repeal of Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0104 /CH0292 (HB0108/CH0293)
Title
St. Mary's County - Regulation of Animals - Dogs
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0366 (HB0432)
Title
Public Health - Rabies Vaccination Information - Submission to Local Agencies and Use for Licensing
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0420 (HB0528)
Title
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0441 /CH0416
Title
Veterans Affairs - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0108 /CH0293 (SB0104/CH0292) St. Mary's County - Regulation of Animals - Dogs St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0187 /CH0290 (SB0103/CH0291) St. Mary's County - Foxes and Hounds - Repeal of Provisions St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0432 (SB0366) Public Health - Rabies Vaccination Information - Submission to Local Agencies and Use for Licensing Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0528 (SB0420) Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2017 Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0626 /CH0409 Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Standards of Care and Protocol Implementation and Enforcement Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 409
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0781 /CH0343 Retail Pet Stores - Animal Seller, Dog Cage Signs, and Records - Requirement Revisions Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1243 Income Tax Credit - Veterinary Services for Adopted Government Service Dogs Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0077 /CH0196 Anne Arundel County and Harford County - Courthouse Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0103 /CH0291 (HB0187/CH0290) St. Mary's County - Foxes and Hounds - Repeal of Provisions Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0104 /CH0292 (HB0108/CH0293) St. Mary's County - Regulation of Animals - Dogs Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0366 (HB0432) Public Health - Rabies Vaccination Information - Submission to Local Agencies and Use for Licensing Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0420 (HB0528) Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2017 Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0441 /CH0416 Veterans Affairs - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Establishment Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM