Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Dogs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0242 /CH0153 (SB0053/CH0152)
Title
Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund - Alteration of Program
Sponsor
Delegate Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0732 (SB0675/CH0236)
Title
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1564
Title
Income Tax Credit - Veterinary Services
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0053 /CH0152 (HB0242/CH0153)
Title
Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund - Alteration of Program
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0238
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Pet Expenses
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0675 /CH0236 (HB0732)
Title
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1211
Title
Vehicle Laws - Operating Vehicle While Animal on Driver's Seat - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0242 /CH0153 (SB0053/CH0152) Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund - Alteration of Program Delegate Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0732 (SB0675/CH0236) Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018 Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1564 Income Tax Credit - Veterinary Services Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0053 /CH0152 (HB0242/CH0153) Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund - Alteration of Program Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/11/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0238 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Pet Expenses Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2018 - 1:30 PM
SB0675 /CH0236 (HB0732) Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018 Senator Hough 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1211 Vehicle Laws - Operating Vehicle While Animal on Driver's Seat - Prohibition Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM