Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Domestic Partnerships and Civil Unions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1104 /CH0503 (SB0276)
Title
Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Evidence of Domestic Partnership
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0276 (HB1104/CH0503)
Title
Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Evidence of Domestic Partnership
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1104 /CH0503 (SB0276) Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Evidence of Domestic Partnership Delegate Hixson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Ways and Means
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0276 (HB1104/CH0503) Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Evidence of Domestic Partnership Senator Madaleno 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Budget and Taxation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM
Click to return on the top page