Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Domestic Violence -see also- Child Abuse & Neglect

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0044
Title
Family Law - Temporary and Final Protective Orders - Emergency Evaluation for Mental Disorder
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0090
Title
Regulated Firearms - Disqualifying Crime - Domestically Related Crime
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306 /CH0116 (SB0337/CH0115)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0307 /CH0112 (SB0333/CH0111)
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of Proof
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0309 /CH0114 (SB0334/CH0113)
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0333 (SB0028)
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of Proof
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0352 (SB0369/CH0159)
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Penalties - Second or Subsequent Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0775 (SB0041)
Title
Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0968 (SB0753)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0986 (SB0951)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence Safe House
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1052 (SB0805/CH0342)
Title
Maryland Uniform Collaborative Law Act
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1182
Title
Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional Relief
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1278
Title
Family Law - Protective Order Proceedings - Jurisdiction - Custody of Minor Child
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0028 (HB0333)
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of Proof
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0035 /CH0007
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence Incident Report - Dissemination
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0041 (HB0775)
Title
Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0333 /CH0111 (HB0307/CH0112)
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of Proof
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0334 /CH0113 (HB0309/CH0114)
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0337 /CH0115 (HB0306/CH0116)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0369 /CH0159 (HB0352)
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Penalties - Second or Subsequent Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0753 (HB0968)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0805 /CH0342 (HB1052)
Title
Maryland Uniform Collaborative Law Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0951 (HB0986)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence Safe House
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0044 Family Law - Temporary and Final Protective Orders - Emergency Evaluation for Mental Disorder Delegate Vitale 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0090 Regulated Firearms - Disqualifying Crime - Domestically Related Crime Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0306 /CH0116 (SB0337/CH0115) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0307 /CH0112 (SB0333/CH0111) Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of Proof Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0309 /CH0114 (SB0334/CH0113) Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0333 (SB0028) Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of Proof Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0352 (SB0369/CH0159) Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Penalties - Second or Subsequent Offenses Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0775 (SB0041) Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0968 (SB0753) Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0986 (SB0951) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence Safe House Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB1052 (SB0805/CH0342) Maryland Uniform Collaborative Law Act Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1182 Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional Relief Delegate Glass 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1278 Family Law - Protective Order Proceedings - Jurisdiction - Custody of Minor Child Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0028 (HB0333) Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of Proof Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0035 /CH0007 Family Law - Domestic Violence Incident Report - Dissemination Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2014 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0041 (HB0775) Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief Senator Shank 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0333 /CH0111 (HB0307/CH0112) Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of Proof Senator Frosh 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0334 /CH0113 (HB0309/CH0114) Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0337 /CH0115 (HB0306/CH0116) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0369 /CH0159 (HB0352) Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Penalties - Second or Subsequent Offenses Senator Stone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0753 (HB0968) Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave Act Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0805 /CH0342 (HB1052) Maryland Uniform Collaborative Law Act Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0951 (HB0986) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence Safe House Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM