Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Domestic Violence -see also- Child Abuse & Neglect

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0224 (SB0315/CH0338)
Title
Domestic Violence - 2-Year Protective Order
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0225 (SB0269/CH0335)
Title
Domestic Violence - Additional Relief
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0227
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0263 /CH0233
Title
Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective Orders - Conspiracy or Solicitation to Commit Murder
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306
Title
Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0385 (SB0040)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0552 /CH0494 (SB0703)
Title
Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Small Employers
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0606 (SB0477/CH0354)
Title
Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0667
Title
Higher Education Institutions - Sexual Assault, Violence, and Stalking - Prevention and Outreach Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0807 (SB0277)
Title
Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional Relief
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0857 (SB0530)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1083 (SB0550)
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1186
Title
Domestic Violence - Confidentiality Program - Name of Victim
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0040 (HB0385)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0269 /CH0335 (HB0225)
Title
Domestic Violence - Additional Relief
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0277 (HB0807)
Title
Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional Relief
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0315 /CH0338 (HB0224)
Title
Domestic Violence - 2-Year Protective Order
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0477 /CH0354 (HB0606)
Title
Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0530 (HB0857)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0550 (HB1083)
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0703 (HB0552/CH0494)
Title
Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Small Employers
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0224 (SB0315/CH0338) Domestic Violence - 2-Year Protective Order Delegate Dumais 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0225 (SB0269/CH0335) Domestic Violence - Additional Relief Delegate Dumais 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0227 Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0263 /CH0233 Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective Orders - Conspiracy or Solicitation to Commit Murder Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0306 Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015 Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0385 (SB0040) Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 12:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/13/2015 - 12:30 PM
HB0552 /CH0494 (SB0703) Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Small Employers Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 494
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/13/2015 - 9:00 AM
HB0606 (SB0477/CH0354) Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0667 Higher Education Institutions - Sexual Assault, Violence, and Stalking - Prevention and Outreach Policies Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0807 (SB0277) Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional Relief Delegate Glass 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0857 (SB0530) Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1083 (SB0550) Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1186 Domestic Violence - Confidentiality Program - Name of Victim Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0040 (HB0385) Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0269 /CH0335 (HB0225) Domestic Violence - Additional Relief Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0277 (HB0807) Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional Relief Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0315 /CH0338 (HB0224) Domestic Violence - 2-Year Protective Order Senator Ramirez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 338
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0477 /CH0354 (HB0606) Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief Senator Ramirez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 354
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0530 (HB0857) Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0550 (HB1083) Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0703 (HB0552/CH0494) Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Small Employers Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM