Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Domestic Violence -see also- Child Abuse & Neglect

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0123 /CH0720
Title
Health Insurance - Required Conformity With Federal Law
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0293 /CH0490 (SB0274)
Title
Family Law - Divorce - Domestic Violence Order
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0294 /CH0805 (SB0224/CH0804)
Title
Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Definition of Convicted of a Disqualifying Crime
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0484 (SB0861)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0501
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Barber and Cosmetology Professionals - Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Awareness Education
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0634 (SB0514)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence and Trafficking Shelters
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0803 (SB0900)
Title
Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of Abuse
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0827
Title
Public Safety - Secretary of State Police - Temporary Firearms Training Waiver
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1057
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1272
Title
Prince George's County - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse PG 314-17
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1297
Title
Domestic Violence - Petitioner - Attorney for Child
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1340 (SB0785)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - The Bernie House
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1575
Title
Prince George's County - Duties of Sheriff - Responding to Domestic Violence Calls PG xx-17
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0224 /CH0804 (HB0294/CH0805)
Title
Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Definition of Convicted of a Disqualifying Crime
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0274 (HB0293/CH0490)
Title
Family Law - Divorce - Domestic Violence Order
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0514 (HB0634)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence and Trafficking Shelters
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0785 (HB1340)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - The Bernie House
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0861 (HB0484)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0900 (HB0803)
Title
Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of Abuse
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1030
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensing and License Renewal - Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Awareness Course
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1092
Title
Public Assistance Fraud Prevention Act
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0123 /CH0720 Health Insurance - Required Conformity With Federal Law Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 720
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0293 /CH0490 (SB0274) Family Law - Divorce - Domestic Violence Order Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490
Judiciary
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0294 /CH0805 (SB0224/CH0804) Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Definition of Convicted of a Disqualifying Crime Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 805
Judiciary
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0484 (SB0861) Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0501 Business Occupations and Professions - Barber and Cosmetology Professionals - Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Awareness Education Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0634 (SB0514) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence and Trafficking Shelters Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 12:00 PM
HB0803 (SB0900) Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of Abuse Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0827 Public Safety - Secretary of State Police - Temporary Firearms Training Waiver Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1057 Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective Orders Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1272 Prince George's County - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse PG 314-17 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1297 Domestic Violence - Petitioner - Attorney for Child Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1340 (SB0785) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - The Bernie House Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 11:00 AM
HB1575 Prince George's County - Duties of Sheriff - Responding to Domestic Violence Calls PG xx-17 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0224 /CH0804 (HB0294/CH0805) Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Definition of Convicted of a Disqualifying Crime Senator Lee 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 804
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0274 (HB0293/CH0490) Family Law - Divorce - Domestic Violence Order Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0)
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0514 (HB0634) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence and Trafficking Shelters Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB0785 (HB1340) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - The Bernie House Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 PM
SB0861 (HB0484) Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0900 (HB0803) Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of Abuse Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1030 State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensing and License Renewal - Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Awareness Course Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1092 Public Assistance Fraud Prevention Act Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM