Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Domestic Violence -see also- Child Abuse & Neglect

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0122 (SB0209)
Title
Protective Orders – Relief Eligibility – Rape and Sexual Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0215 (SB0005/CH0297)
Title
Public Information Act - 9-1-1 Communications - Denial of Part of a Public Record
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0397 /CH0301 (SB0339/CH0302)
Title
Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0665 (SB0811)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0672 /CH0248 (SB0810/CH0249)
Title
Housing – Local Housing Grant Program for Homeless Veterans and Survivors of Domestic Violence
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0005 /CH0297 (HB0215)
Title
Public Information Act - 9-1-1 Communications - Denial of Part of a Public Record
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0209 (HB0122)
Title
Peace Orders – Relief Eligibility and Duration – Rape and Sexual Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0339 /CH0302 (HB0397/CH0301)
Title
Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0567 /CH0052
Title
Workgroup to Study Child Custody Court Proceedings Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence Allegations
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0810 /CH0249 (HB0672/CH0248)
Title
Housing – Local Housing Grant Program for Homeless Veterans and Survivors of Domestic Violence
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0811 (HB0665)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0962
Title
Correctional Services - Offender Rehabilitation and Reentry Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0122 (SB0209) Protective Orders – Relief Eligibility – Rape and Sexual Offenses Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (117-18)
Judiciary
1/31/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0215 (SB0005/CH0297) Public Information Act - 9-1-1 Communications - Denial of Part of a Public Record Delegate Jackson 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/05/2019 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0397 /CH0301 (SB0339/CH0302) Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law) Delegate Krebs 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0665 (SB0811) Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0672 /CH0248 (SB0810/CH0249) Housing – Local Housing Grant Program for Homeless Veterans and Survivors of Domestic Violence Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0005 /CH0297 (HB0215) Public Information Act - 9-1-1 Communications - Denial of Part of a Public Record Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 297
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2019 - 4:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0209 (HB0122) Peace Orders – Relief Eligibility and Duration – Rape and Sexual Offenses Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0339 /CH0302 (HB0397/CH0301) Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System (Carl Henn's Law) Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Finance
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0567 /CH0052 Workgroup to Study Child Custody Court Proceedings Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence Allegations Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0810 /CH0249 (HB0672/CH0248) Housing – Local Housing Grant Program for Homeless Veterans and Survivors of Domestic Violence Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0811 (HB0665) Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0962 Correctional Services - Offender Rehabilitation and Reentry Program - Establishment Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:22 PM