Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Domestic Violence -see also- Child Abuse & Neglect

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0170 (SB0581)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0248 (SB0210)
Title
Protective Orders - Relief Eligibility - Rape and Sexual Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0433
Title
Prince George's County - Office of the Sheriff - Response to Report of Alleged Domestic Violence - Authorization PG 309-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0744
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1103 (SB0924)
Title
Maryland Child Abduction Prevention Act
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1114
Title
Child Custody and Visitation - Best Interest of the Child - Factors
Sponsor
Delegate Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1231 (SB0949)
Title
Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1313 (SB0787)
Title
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1343
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1409
Title
Prince George's County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution of Proceeds PG 411-20
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1578 (SB0476)
Title
Facial Recognition Privacy Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0004
Title
Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering Referendum and Minority Business Enterprise Disparity Study
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0210 (HB0248)
Title
Protective Orders - Relief Eligibility - Rape and Sexual Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0213 (HB0076)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims and Witnesses - Restrictions on Release of Personal Information
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0476 (HB1578)
Title
Facial Recognition Privacy Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0581 (HB0170)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787 (HB1313)
Title
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0924 (HB1103)
Title
Maryland Child Abduction Prevention Act
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0949 (HB1231)
Title
Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0170 (SB0581) Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0248 (SB0210) Protective Orders - Relief Eligibility - Rape and Sexual Offenses Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Judiciary
1/30/2020 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0433 Prince George's County - Office of the Sheriff - Response to Report of Alleged Domestic Violence - Authorization PG 309-20 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0744 Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Tenant Rights and Protections (Tenant Protection Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1103 (SB0924) Maryland Child Abduction Prevention Act Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1114 Child Custody and Visitation - Best Interest of the Child - Factors Delegate Charles 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1231 (SB0949) Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1313 (SB0787) Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB1343 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion Delegate Mosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1409 Prince George's County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution of Proceeds PG 411-20 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1578 (SB0476) Facial Recognition Privacy Protection Act Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
SB0004 Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering Referendum and Minority Business Enterprise Disparity Study Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0210 (HB0248) Protective Orders - Relief Eligibility - Rape and Sexual Offenses Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0213 (HB0076) Criminal Procedure - Victims and Witnesses - Restrictions on Release of Personal Information Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2020 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0476 (HB1578) Facial Recognition Privacy Protection Act Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0581 (HB0170) Criminal Procedure - Family Law Services for Sustained Safety Fund Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
SB0787 (HB1313) Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Finance
3/06/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
SB0924 (HB1103) Maryland Child Abduction Prevention Act Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0949 (HB1231) Family Law – Authorization for a Minor to Marry Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/19/2020 10:37 AM