Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Dorchester County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0167 /CH0123 (SB0060/CH0122)
Title
Dorchester County - Class B Beer and Light Wine Licenses - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0180 /CH0126 (SB0076/CH0125)
Title
Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0192 (SB0202)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Choptank River Lighthouse Museum Artifact Acquisition Project
Sponsor
Delegate Cane
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0208 /CH0518 (SB0546/CH0517)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0285 (SB0152/CH0040)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013 - Dorchester County - Cambridge Marine Terminal Redevelopment
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0356 /CH0596
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 8 Farm Breweries - Festival Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0390 (SB0057/CH0121)
Title
Office of the State's Attorney - Dorchester County - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0594 (SB0762)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Chesapeake Grove Senior Housing and Intergenerational Center
Sponsor
Delegate Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0855 (SB0038)
Title
Chesapeake College - Board of Trustees - Appointment of Members
Sponsor
Caroline County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0031
Title
Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0038 (HB0855)
Title
Chesapeake College - Board of Trustees - Appointment of Members
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0051
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Choptank River Lighthouse Museum Artifact Acquisition Project
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0057 /CH0121 (HB0390)
Title
Office of the State's Attorney - Dorchester County - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0060 /CH0122 (HB0167/CH0123)
Title
Dorchester County - Class B Beer and Light Wine Licenses - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0076 /CH0125 (HB0180/CH0126)
Title
Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0152 /CH0040 (HB0285)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013 - Dorchester County - Cambridge Marine Terminal Redevelopment
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0202 (HB0192)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Choptank River Lighthouse Museum Artifact Acquisition Project
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0546 /CH0517 (HB0208/CH0518)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0762 (HB0594)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Chesapeake Grove Senior Housing and Intergenerational Center
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0167 /CH0123 (SB0060/CH0122) Dorchester County - Class B Beer and Light Wine Licenses - Sunday Sales Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0180 /CH0126 (SB0076/CH0125) Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0192 (SB0202) Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Choptank River Lighthouse Museum Artifact Acquisition Project Delegate Cane 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 11:00 AM
HB0208 /CH0518 (SB0546/CH0517) Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0285 (SB0152/CH0040) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013 - Dorchester County - Cambridge Marine Terminal Redevelopment Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0356 /CH0596 Alcoholic Beverages - Class 8 Farm Breweries - Festival Licenses Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 596
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0390 (SB0057/CH0121) Office of the State's Attorney - Dorchester County - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0594 (SB0762) Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Chesapeake Grove Senior Housing and Intergenerational Center Delegate Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0855 (SB0038) Chesapeake College - Board of Trustees - Appointment of Members Caroline County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0031 Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement Senator Colburn 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0038 (HB0855) Chesapeake College - Board of Trustees - Appointment of Members Senator Colburn 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0051 Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Choptank River Lighthouse Museum Artifact Acquisition Project Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0057 /CH0121 (HB0390) Office of the State's Attorney - Dorchester County - Authority to Appoint Criminal Investigators Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2014 - 1:30 PM
Environmental Matters
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0060 /CH0122 (HB0167/CH0123) Dorchester County - Class B Beer and Light Wine Licenses - Sunday Sales Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2014 - 2:45 PM
Economic Matters
SB0076 /CH0125 (HB0180/CH0126) Dorchester County Sanitary Commission - Enforcement of Liens - Tax Sale Authorization Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0152 /CH0040 (HB0285) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013 - Dorchester County - Cambridge Marine Terminal Redevelopment Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 40
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0202 (HB0192) Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Choptank River Lighthouse Museum Artifact Acquisition Project Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 2:00 PM
SB0546 /CH0517 (HB0208/CH0518) Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels Senator Reilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0762 (HB0594) Creation of a State Debt - Dorchester County - Chesapeake Grove Senior Housing and Intergenerational Center Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM