Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Dorchester County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0023 (SB0094)
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0024 /CH0030 (SB0100/CH0031)
Title
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0173 /CH0095
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0603 (SB0794/CH0583)
Title
County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0732
Title
Taxation – Tobacco Tax, Sales and Use Tax, and Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1130 (SB0312)
Title
Talbot County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1300 (SB1000)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1353
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Severance Tax - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1544
Title
Public Ethics and Campaign Activity - County Council Members and County Executives - Limitations on Applicant Contributions
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0094 (HB0023)
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration – Exception for Golf Carts – Hoopers Island and Taylors Island
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0100 /CH0031 (HB0024/CH0030)
Title
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0312 (HB1130)
Title
Talbot County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0794 /CH0583 (HB0603)
Title
County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1000 (HB1300)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0023 (SB0094) Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0024 /CH0030 (SB0100/CH0031) Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C Beer, Wine, and Liquor License Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 30
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0173 /CH0095 Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 95
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2020 - 11:00 AM
HB0603 (SB0794/CH0583) County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0732 Taxation – Tobacco Tax, Sales and Use Tax, and Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Budget and Taxation
HB1130 (SB0312) Talbot County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1300 (SB1000) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation Speaker 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
HB1353 Natural Resources - Oyster Severance Tax - Increase Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1544 Public Ethics and Campaign Activity - County Council Members and County Executives - Limitations on Applicant Contributions Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0094 (HB0023) Motor Vehicle Registration – Exception for Golf Carts – Hoopers Island and Taylors Island Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
1/15/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0100 /CH0031 (HB0024/CH0030) Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C Beer, Wine, and Liquor License Senator Eckardt 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 31
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0312 (HB1130) Talbot County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0794 /CH0583 (HB0603) County Boards of Education - Establishing Regional Career and Technical Education Schools - Authority Senator Hershey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 583
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB1000 (HB1300) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Implementation President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2020 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 2:17 PM