Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Dredging

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1244 (SB0795)
Title
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1485
Title
Oyster Sanctuaries - Oyster Bar Cleaning and Removal of Diseased Oysters
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1505 /CH0689 (SB1032)
Title
Oysters - Power Dredging - Time Period
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0059 /CH0173
Title
Natural Resources - Fish and Fisheries
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0795 (HB1244)
Title
Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1032 (HB1505/CH0689)
Title
Oysters - Power Dredging - Time Period
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1244 (SB0795) Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1485 Oyster Sanctuaries - Oyster Bar Cleaning and Removal of Diseased Oysters Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1505 /CH0689 (SB1032) Oysters - Power Dredging - Time Period Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 689
Environmental Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0059 /CH0173 Natural Resources - Fish and Fisheries Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 173
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0795 (HB1244) Oyster Dredging - Waters North of the Chesapeake Bay Bridge and Kent Narrows Bridge Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1032 (HB1505/CH0689) Oysters - Power Dredging - Time Period Senator Colburn 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM
Click to return on the top page