Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Dredging

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0638
Title
Natural Resources - Oysters - Shell Seeding, Shell Replenishment, and Rotational Harvest
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0821 /CH0458
Title
Environment - Cox Creek Citizens Oversight Committee - Composition - Second Duties
Sponsor
Delegate Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1036 (SB0696)
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1274
Title
Oysters and Clams - Dredging by Auxiliary Yawl - Authorized Vessels
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0696 (HB1036)
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0638 Natural Resources - Oysters - Shell Seeding, Shell Replenishment, and Rotational Harvest Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0821 /CH0458 Environment - Cox Creek Citizens Oversight Committee - Composition - Second Duties Delegate Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 458
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1036 (SB0696) Natural Resources - Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1274 Oysters and Clams - Dredging by Auxiliary Yawl - Authorized Vessels Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0696 (HB1036) Natural Resources - Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM