Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Driver Education

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0912 (SB0768)
Title
Driver Education Program - Classroom Instruction - Organ, Eye, and Tissue Donation Education
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1336
Title
Driver's Education - Income Tax Credit - Assessment of Fees for Driving Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0768 (HB0912)
Title
Organ Donation Driver Education Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0912 (SB0768) Driver Education Program - Classroom Instruction - Organ, Eye, and Tissue Donation Education Delegate Clagett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1336 Driver's Education - Income Tax Credit - Assessment of Fees for Driving Offenses Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0768 (HB0912) Organ Donation Driver Education Act of 2013 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM
Click to return on the top page