Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Driver Education

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0008 (SB0126)
Title
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0559
Title
Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0627 (SB0708)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Education Schools and Instructors
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0720 /CH0402 (SB0544/CH0401)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Insurance Identification Card - Carrying Proof of Coverage - Uninsured Motorist Education and Enforcement Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0805 (SB0774/CH0231)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0967 (SB0423)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Driver Education Program Curriculum - Police Traffic Stop Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1039
Title
Motor Vehicles - Driver Education Program Curriculum - Police Traffic Stop Procedures and Basic Vehicle Maintenance
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1224
Title
Organ Donation Driver Education Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0126 (HB0008)
Title
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0423 (HB0967)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Driver Education Program Curriculum - Police Traffic Stop Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0544 /CH0401 (HB0720/CH0402)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Insurance Identification Card - Carrying Proof of Coverage - Uninsured Motorist Education and Enforcement Fund
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708 (HB0627)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Education Schools and Instructors
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0774 /CH0231 (HB0805)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0008 (SB0126) Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2016 - 1:30 PM
HB0559 Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0627 (SB0708) Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Education Schools and Instructors Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0720 /CH0402 (SB0544/CH0401) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Insurance Identification Card - Carrying Proof of Coverage - Uninsured Motorist Education and Enforcement Fund Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402
Economic Matters
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0805 (SB0774/CH0231) Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and Requirements Delegate Beidle 2 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0967 (SB0423) Motor Vehicles - Driver Education Program Curriculum - Police Traffic Stop Procedures Delegate Cassilly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1039 Motor Vehicles - Driver Education Program Curriculum - Police Traffic Stop Procedures and Basic Vehicle Maintenance Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1224 Organ Donation Driver Education Act of 2016 Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0126 (HB0008) Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0423 (HB0967) Motor Vehicles - Driver Education Program Curriculum - Police Traffic Stop Procedures Senator Norman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0544 /CH0401 (HB0720/CH0402) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Insurance Identification Card - Carrying Proof of Coverage - Uninsured Motorist Education and Enforcement Fund Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Finance
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0708 (HB0627) Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Education Schools and Instructors Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0774 /CH0231 (HB0805) Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and Requirements Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM