Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Driver Education

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0205
Title
Drivers' Licenses - Learners' Permits - Minimum Duration
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0045 /CH0195
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Instructors - Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0799 /CH0488 (HB0844)
Title
Driver Improvement Program and Failure to Pay Child Support - Driver's License Suspensions - Penalties and Assessment of Points
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0205 Drivers' Licenses - Learners' Permits - Minimum Duration Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2017 - 1:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0045 /CH0195 Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Instructors - Criminal History Records Checks Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0799 /CH0488 (HB0844) Driver Improvement Program and Failure to Pay Child Support - Driver's License Suspensions - Penalties and Assessment of Points Senator Muse 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 488
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM
Click to return on the top page