Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Driver Education

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0118
Title
Vehicle Laws – Drivers’ Education Schools – Age of Instruction Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0142
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0372 /CH0352 (SB0277/CH0351)
Title
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0394 (SB0424/CH0505)
Title
Driver’s Licenses – Learner’s Permits – Minimum Duration
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0889
Title
Motor Vehicles - Driver's License Examination - Parallel Parking
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0998
Title
Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Schools - Age of Instruction Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1099 (SB0868)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1161 /CH0195 (SB0856/CH0196)
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured Motorists
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1375
Title
Driver Education Curriculum - Rights of Drivers Involved in Traffic Stops
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1462 (SB0701)
Title
Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0277 /CH0351 (HB0372/CH0352)
Title
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0424 /CH0505 (HB0394)
Title
Driver’s Licenses – Learner’s Permits – Minimum Duration
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0701 (HB1462)
Title
Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0856 /CH0196 (HB1161/CH0195)
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured Motorists
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0868 (HB1099)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0118 Vehicle Laws – Drivers’ Education Schools – Age of Instruction Vehicles Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0142 Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - Penalties Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0372 /CH0352 (SB0277/CH0351) Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act Delegate Korman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0394 (SB0424/CH0505) Driver’s Licenses – Learner’s Permits – Minimum Duration Delegate Dumais 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0889 Motor Vehicles - Driver's License Examination - Parallel Parking Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0998 Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Schools - Age of Instruction Vehicles Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1099 (SB0868) Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1161 /CH0195 (SB0856/CH0196) Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured Motorists Delegate Brooks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Economic Matters
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1375 Driver Education Curriculum - Rights of Drivers Involved in Traffic Stops Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1462 (SB0701) Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0277 /CH0351 (HB0372/CH0352) Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2018 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0424 /CH0505 (HB0394) Driver’s Licenses – Learner’s Permits – Minimum Duration Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0701 (HB1462) Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0856 /CH0196 (HB1161/CH0195) Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Uninsured Division - Uninsured Motorists Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0868 (HB1099) Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - Penalties Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM