Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Driver Education

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0005 (SB0146/CH0233)
Title
Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0112 (SB0804)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0146 /CH0233 (HB0005)
Title
Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0462
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driving Without a License or While License is Suspended - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0804 (HB0112)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Reckless Driving Contributing to an Accident – Required Court Appearance
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0981
Title
Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0005 (SB0146/CH0233) Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
1/30/2019 - 2:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0112 (SB0804) Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 12:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0146 /CH0233 (HB0005) Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0462 Vehicle Laws - Driving Without a License or While License is Suspended - Penalties Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0804 (HB0112) Vehicle Laws – Reckless Driving Contributing to an Accident – Required Court Appearance Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2019 - 12:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0981 Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:22 PM