Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Driver Education

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0280 /CH0149 (SB0234/CH0150)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Suspension of Driver's License or Registration - Unpaid Citations or Judgments
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0721 (SB0512)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1262
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driving in Right-Hand Lanes
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0234 /CH0150 (HB0280/CH0149)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Suspension of Driver's License or Registration - Unpaid Citations or Judgments
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0512 (HB0721)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0280 /CH0149 (SB0234/CH0150) Vehicle Laws - Suspension of Driver's License or Registration - Unpaid Citations or Judgments Speaker 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 149
Judiciary
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0721 (SB0512) Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1262 Vehicle Laws - Driving in Right-Hand Lanes Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0234 /CH0150 (HB0280/CH0149) Vehicle Laws - Suspension of Driver's License or Registration - Unpaid Citations or Judgments President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 150
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0512 (HB0721) Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:12 PM