Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Drivers' Licenses

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0031
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Public Records Inspections - Young Persons
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0176 /CH0710 (SB0299)
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Golden Beach Patuxent Knolls
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0205
Title
Drivers' Licenses - Learners' Permits - Minimum Duration
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0244 (SB1163)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Duplicate Drivers' Licenses - Victims of Robbery
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0330
Title
Vehicle Laws - Young Drivers - Hour Restriction
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0539
Title
Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0563
Title
Vehicle Laws - Provisional Drivers' Licenses - Issuance
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0844 (SB0799/CH0488)
Title
Driver Improvement Program and Failure to Pay Child Support - Driver's License Suspensions - Penalties and Assessment of Points
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0969
Title
Suspension of Driving Privileges - Dispensing Motor Fuel Into Dirt Bike
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1013 (SB0902)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Safe Autonomous Vehicle (SAVE) Act
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1047 (SB0906/CH0204)
Title
Child Support - Noncompliance With Court Order - License Suspension
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1490
Title
Drunk Driving - Administrative Per Se Offenses - Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0089
Title
Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Licenses and Vehicle Registrations - Mailing Address
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0290 /CH0725
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance Policies - Placement and Reinstatement
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0299 (HB0176/CH0710)
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Golden Beach Patuxent Knolls
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0342
Title
Driver's Licenses - School Bus Drivers - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0470
Title
Consumer Protection - Scanning Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0799 /CH0488 (HB0844)
Title
Driver Improvement Program and Failure to Pay Child Support - Driver's License Suspensions - Penalties and Assessment of Points
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0902 (HB1013)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Safe Autonomous Vehicle (SAVE) Act
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0906 /CH0204 (HB1047)
Title
Child Support -Noncompliance With Court Order - License Suspension
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0979 /CH0694
Title
Vehicle Laws - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1097
Title
Vehicle Registration - Exception for Municipal RTV Utility Vehicles - Town of Sykesville
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1163 (HB0244)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Duplicate Drivers' Licenses - Victims of Robbery
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0031 Motor Vehicle Administration - Public Records Inspections - Young Persons Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2017 - 2:00 PM
HB0176 /CH0710 (SB0299) Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Golden Beach Patuxent Knolls Delegate Morgan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 710
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2017 - 1:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0205 Drivers' Licenses - Learners' Permits - Minimum Duration Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2017 - 1:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0244 (SB1163) Motor Vehicles - Duplicate Drivers' Licenses - Victims of Robbery Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0330 Vehicle Laws - Young Drivers - Hour Restriction Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0539 Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of Citizenship Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0563 Vehicle Laws - Provisional Drivers' Licenses - Issuance Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0844 (SB0799/CH0488) Driver Improvement Program and Failure to Pay Child Support - Driver's License Suspensions - Penalties and Assessment of Points Delegate Moon 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Judiciary
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0969 Suspension of Driving Privileges - Dispensing Motor Fuel Into Dirt Bike Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1013 (SB0902) Vehicle Laws - Safe Autonomous Vehicle (SAVE) Act Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1047 (SB0906/CH0204) Child Support - Noncompliance With Court Order - License Suspension Delegate Moon 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Judiciary
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1490 Drunk Driving - Administrative Per Se Offenses - Ignition Interlock System Program Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0089 Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Licenses and Vehicle Registrations - Mailing Address Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0290 /CH0725 Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance Policies - Placement and Reinstatement Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 725
Finance
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0299 (HB0176/CH0710) Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Golden Beach Patuxent Knolls Senator Waugh 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0342 Driver's Licenses - School Bus Drivers - Requirements Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0470 Consumer Protection - Scanning Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - Prohibition Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0799 /CH0488 (HB0844) Driver Improvement Program and Failure to Pay Child Support - Driver's License Suspensions - Penalties and Assessment of Points Senator Muse 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 488
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0902 (HB1013) Vehicle Laws - Safe Autonomous Vehicle (SAVE) Act Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0906 /CH0204 (HB1047) Child Support -Noncompliance With Court Order - License Suspension Senator Muse 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 204
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0979 /CH0694 Vehicle Laws - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 694
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1097 Vehicle Registration - Exception for Municipal RTV Utility Vehicles - Town of Sykesville Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB1163 (HB0244) Motor Vehicles - Duplicate Drivers' Licenses - Victims of Robbery Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM