Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Drunk and Drugged Driving

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032
Title
Drunk Driving - Transporting Minor - Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0150
Title
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Death or Life-Threatening Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing (Kara's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0556 (SB0468)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Misdemeanor Violations - Unsupervised Probation
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0627 (SB0850)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0765 (SB0959)
Title
Drugged Driving - Drug Recognition Expert - Testimony
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0987
Title
Punitive Damages - High-Risk Drunk Drivers
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1336
Title
Driver's Education - Income Tax Credit - Assessment of Fees for Driving Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1453
Title
Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and Taxation
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1490
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Refusal to Take a Blood or Breath Test - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0074
Title
Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or Drugs
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0292
Title
Vehicle Laws - Administrative Per Se Offenses - Suspension Modification and Restrictive Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0468 (HB0556)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Misdemeanor Violations - Unsupervised Probation
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0850 (HB0627)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0959 (HB0765)
Title
Drugged Driving - Drug Recognition Expert - Testimony
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0032 Drunk Driving - Transporting Minor - Ignition Interlock System Program Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/23/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0150 Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Death or Life-Threatening Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing (Kara's Law) Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/30/2013 - 2:30 PM
HB0556 (SB0468) Vehicle Laws - Misdemeanor Violations - Unsupervised Probation Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0627 (SB0850) Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0765 (SB0959) Drugged Driving - Drug Recognition Expert - Testimony Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0987 Punitive Damages - High-Risk Drunk Drivers Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1336 Driver's Education - Income Tax Credit - Assessment of Fees for Driving Offenses Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1453 Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and Taxation Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1490 Drunk and Drugged Driving - Refusal to Take a Blood or Breath Test - Prohibition Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0074 Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or Drugs Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0292 Vehicle Laws - Administrative Per Se Offenses - Suspension Modification and Restrictive Licenses Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0468 (HB0556) Vehicle Laws - Misdemeanor Violations - Unsupervised Probation Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0850 (HB0627) Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0959 (HB0765) Drugged Driving - Drug Recognition Expert - Testimony Senator Getty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM