Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Drunk and Drugged Driving

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 (SB0093)
Title
Civil Action - Wrongfully Selling or Furnishing Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0395
Title
Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0423 (SB0212)
Title
Driving Under the Influence - Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0430 /CH0247
Title
Drunk Driving - Accidents Resulting in Death - Sanctions for Administrative Per Se Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0532
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Death or Life-Threatening Injury - Mandatory Tests
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0872
Title
Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911 (SB0531)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0093 (HB0102)
Title
Civil Action - Wrongfully Selling or Furnishing Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0212 (HB0423)
Title
Driving Under the Influence - Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0232
Title
Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0395
Title
Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0517
Title
Criminal Law - Use and Possession of Marijuana and Drug Paraphernalia
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0531 (HB0911)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0605
Title
Aggressive Drunk Driving - Punitive Damages
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0102 (SB0093) Civil Action - Wrongfully Selling or Furnishing Alcoholic Beverages Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0395 Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/04/2015 - 1:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0423 (SB0212) Driving Under the Influence - Ignition Interlock System Program Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2015 - 1:15 PM
HB0430 /CH0247 Drunk Driving - Accidents Resulting in Death - Sanctions for Administrative Per Se Offenses Delegate Folden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 247
Judiciary
3/04/2015 - 1:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0532 Drunk and Drugged Driving - Death or Life-Threatening Injury - Mandatory Tests Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2015 - 1:15 PM
HB0872 Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2015 Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2015 - 1:15 PM
HB0911 (SB0531) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0093 (HB0102) Civil Action - Wrongfully Selling or Furnishing Alcoholic Beverages Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0212 (HB0423) Driving Under the Influence - Ignition Interlock System Program Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0232 Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0395 Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2015 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0517 Criminal Law - Use and Possession of Marijuana and Drug Paraphernalia Senator Zirkin 2 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 4 of 2016
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0531 (HB0911) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0605 Aggressive Drunk Driving - Punitive Damages Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM