Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Drunk and Drugged Driving

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0055 /CH0065 (SB0245/CH0066)
Title
Transportation - Ignition Interlock System - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0230 (SB0163)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders - Felonies (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0310
Title
Task Force to Study Impaired Driving and New Technologies
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0350 (SB0418)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0632
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Use, Possession, Cultivation, and Sale
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0656 (SB0771)
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0707 /CH0020
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving Offenses – Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0813 (SB0814)
Title
Drunk Driving - Administrative Per Se Offenses - Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0910
Title
Driving While Impaired by Alcohol - Transporting a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0943
Title
Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0163 (HB0230)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders - Felonies (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2019)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0245 /CH0066 (HB0055/CH0065)
Title
Transportation – Ignition Interlock System – Definition
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0383
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Law Enforcement and Dispensaries
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0418 (HB0350)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0771 (HB0656)
Title
Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0814 (HB0813)
Title
Drunk Driving - Administrative Per Se Offenses - Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0055 /CH0065 (SB0245/CH0066) Transportation - Ignition Interlock System - Definition Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Judiciary
1/24/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0230 (SB0163) Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders - Felonies (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2019) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0310 Task Force to Study Impaired Driving and New Technologies Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0350 (SB0418) Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0632 Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Use, Possession, Cultivation, and Sale Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0656 (SB0771) Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0707 /CH0020 Drunk and Drugged Driving Offenses – Penalties Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 20
Judiciary
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0813 (SB0814) Drunk Driving - Administrative Per Se Offenses - Ignition Interlock System Program Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0910 Driving While Impaired by Alcohol - Transporting a Minor - Penalties Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0943 Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
SB0163 (HB0230) Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders - Felonies (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2019) President 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0245 /CH0066 (HB0055/CH0065) Transportation – Ignition Interlock System – Definition Senator Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 66
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0383 Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Law Enforcement and Dispensaries Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0418 (HB0350) Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - Prohibition Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0771 (HB0656) Cannabis - Legalization, Taxation, and Regulation Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0814 (HB0813) Drunk Driving - Administrative Per Se Offenses - Ignition Interlock System Program Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:22 PM