Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Juvenile Law (E3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0079 /CH0213 (SB0068)
Title
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0151 /CH0216
Title
Juvenile Services - Child in Need of Supervision Pilot Program - Reporting Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0222 /CH0218
Title
Education - Reportable Offenses - First Degree Burglary and Animal Cruelty
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0242 (SB0282/CH0152)
Title
Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Program - Kent County
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0407 (SB0485)
Title
Juvenile Law - Prohibition Against Continued Detention
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0994
Title
Task Force on the Creation of a Juvenile Assessment Center and Constructive Alternatives to Managing Youth at Risk of Delinquency in Prince George's County PG 306-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1035 /CH0439
Title
Prince George's County Juvenile Court and School Safety Workgroup - Membership and Duties PG 305-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1294 (SB0757)
Title
Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1295 (SB0515/CH0178)
Title
Juvenile Law - Transfer of Cases to Juvenile Court
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0068 (HB0079/CH0213)
Title
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116 /CH0135
Title
Juvenile Law - Committed Facilities - Extension of Termination Date
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0117
Title
Juvenile Law - Commitment - Placement Visits
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0118 /CH0033
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Services Education - Facilities
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0122 /CH0035
Title
Juvenile Law - Detention - Community Detention Violation Hearings
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0282 /CH0152 (HB0242)
Title
Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Program - Kent County
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0485 (HB0407)
Title
Juvenile Law - Prohibition Against Continued Detention
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0515 /CH0178 (HB1295)
Title
Juvenile Law - Transfer of Cases to Juvenile Court
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0757 (HB1294)
Title
Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1038
Title
Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Programs - Authorized in All Counties
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0079 /CH0213 (SB0068) Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 213
Judiciary
1/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0151 /CH0216 Juvenile Services - Child in Need of Supervision Pilot Program - Reporting Requirement Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Judiciary
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0222 /CH0218 Education - Reportable Offenses - First Degree Burglary and Animal Cruelty Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Judiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0242 (SB0282/CH0152) Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Program - Kent County Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0407 (SB0485) Juvenile Law - Prohibition Against Continued Detention Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0994 Task Force on the Creation of a Juvenile Assessment Center and Constructive Alternatives to Managing Youth at Risk of Delinquency in Prince George's County PG 306-14 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1035 /CH0439 Prince George's County Juvenile Court and School Safety Workgroup - Membership and Duties PG 305-14 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439
Ways and Means
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1294 (SB0757) Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1295 (SB0515/CH0178) Juvenile Law - Transfer of Cases to Juvenile Court Delegate Carter 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0068 (HB0079/CH0213) Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of Records Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0116 /CH0135 Juvenile Law - Committed Facilities - Extension of Termination Date Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Judicial Proceedings
1/09/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0117 Juvenile Law - Commitment - Placement Visits Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/09/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0118 /CH0033 Juvenile Law - Juvenile Services Education - Facilities Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2014 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0122 /CH0035 Juvenile Law - Detention - Community Detention Violation Hearings Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 35
Judicial Proceedings
1/09/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0282 /CH0152 (HB0242) Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Program - Kent County Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0485 (HB0407) Juvenile Law - Prohibition Against Continued Detention Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0515 /CH0178 (HB1295) Juvenile Law - Transfer of Cases to Juvenile Court Senator Gladden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0757 (HB1294) Juveniles - Transfer Determinations - Confinement in Juvenile Facilities Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1038 Juvenile Law - Truancy Reduction Pilot Programs - Authorized in All Counties Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM