Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Juvenile Law (E3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0471 (SB0215)
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0721 /CH0653 (SB0674/CH0654)
Title
Juvenile Services - Services and Programs for Females
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0853
Title
Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum Age
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0893 (SB0583)
Title
Juvenile Law - Probation
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0928 (SB0907)
Title
Juvenile Law - Procedure - Appearance by Video Conference
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1187 (SB0784)
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Youth Services Bureau - Budget Appropriation
Sponsor
Delegate Gaines
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1255 (SB0981)
Title
Juveniles - Mechanical Restraints
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1256 (SB0982/CH0487)
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Implementation of Task Force Recommendations - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1569
Title
Prince George's County - Juvenile Offender in Need of Supervision Program - Study PG 304-17
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0005
Title
Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum Age
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0035 /CH0194
Title
Juvenile Law - Informal Adjustment - Mental Health Program
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0043 /CH0193
Title
Juvenile Court Records - Disclosure
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0215 (HB0471)
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0583 (HB0893)
Title
Juvenile Law - Probation
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0674 /CH0654 (HB0721/CH0653)
Title
Juvenile Services - Services and Programs for Females
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0784 (HB1187)
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Youth Services Bureau - Budget Appropriation
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0904
Title
Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum Age
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0907 (HB0928)
Title
Juvenile Law - Procedure - Appearance by Video Conference
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0981 (HB1255)
Title
Juveniles - Mechanical Restraints
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0982 /CH0487 (HB1256)
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Implementation of Task Force Recommendations - Report
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0471 (SB0215) Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0721 /CH0653 (SB0674/CH0654) Juvenile Services - Services and Programs for Females Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 653
Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0853 Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum Age Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0893 (SB0583) Juvenile Law - Probation Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0928 (SB0907) Juvenile Law - Procedure - Appearance by Video Conference Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1187 (SB0784) Department of Juvenile Services - Youth Services Bureau - Budget Appropriation Delegate Gaines 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1255 (SB0981) Juveniles - Mechanical Restraints Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1256 (SB0982/CH0487) Department of Juvenile Services - Implementation of Task Force Recommendations - Report Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (98-21)
Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1569 Prince George's County - Juvenile Offender in Need of Supervision Program - Study PG 304-17 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0005 Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum Age Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0035 /CH0194 Juvenile Law - Informal Adjustment - Mental Health Program Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0043 /CH0193 Juvenile Court Records - Disclosure Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0215 (HB0471) Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0583 (HB0893) Juvenile Law - Probation Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0674 /CH0654 (HB0721/CH0653) Juvenile Services - Services and Programs for Females Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0784 (HB1187) Department of Juvenile Services - Youth Services Bureau - Budget Appropriation Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0904 Juvenile Law - Continued Detention - Minimum Age Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0907 (HB0928) Juvenile Law - Procedure - Appearance by Video Conference Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0981 (HB1255) Juveniles - Mechanical Restraints Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0982 /CH0487 (HB1256) Department of Juvenile Services - Implementation of Task Force Recommendations - Report Senator Muse 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 487
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM