Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Easements

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0276 /CH0352 (SB0137/CH0351)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1643 (SB0371)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0137 /CH0351 (HB0276/CH0352)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0371 (HB1643)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1157
Title
Public Service Company - Easement - Policy and Notice for Performing Work
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0276 /CH0352 (SB0137/CH0351) Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1643 (SB0371) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0137 /CH0351 (HB0276/CH0352) Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0371 (HB1643) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements Senator Peters 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/11/2016 - 9:00 AM
SB1157 Public Service Company - Easement - Policy and Notice for Performing Work Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM