Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Easements

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0043 /CH0303
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0198 /CH0293
Title
Inheritance Tax – Perpetual Conservation Easement – Farming Purposes – Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0609 /CH0089 (SB0360)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0784 /CH0773
Title
Electric Facilities – Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines – Additional Notice Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0794 (SB0692)
Title
Public Service Commission - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines - Location
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0961 /CH0176
Title
Rural Broadband Communication Services
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1120
Title
Land Use - Zoning - Agritourism Activities
Sponsor
Delegate Rey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1168 (SB1125)
Title
Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Surface Mining
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1229 /CH0066
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Use of Land – Signs and Outdoor Advertising Displays
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1230 /CH0170 (SB0960/CH0171)
Title
Maryland Historical Trust - Property Subject to Historic Preservation Easement - Application for Change or Alteration
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1345
Title
Sewerage Systems - Residential Major Subdivisions in Tier III and Tier IV Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1351 /CH0492
Title
Agriculture – Easements – Special Occasion Events
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1736 (SB1140/CH0623)
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Lot Release
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0360 (HB0609/CH0089)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0571 /CH0644
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Use of Land - Signs and Outdoor Advertising Displays
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692 (HB0794)
Title
Public Service Commission - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines - Location
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0885 /CH0622
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Condemnation of Land Under Easement
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0960 /CH0171 (HB1230/CH0170)
Title
Maryland Historical Trust - Property Subject to Historic Preservation Easement - Application for Change or Alteration
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0997
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1125 (HB1168)
Title
Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Surface Mining
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1140 /CH0623 (HB1736)
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Definition of Child
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1235
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements - Credit Transfer
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0043 /CH0303 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements Delegate Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Ways and Means
1/17/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0198 /CH0293 Inheritance Tax – Perpetual Conservation Easement – Farming Purposes – Exemption Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293
Ways and Means
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0609 /CH0089 (SB0360) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0784 /CH0773 Electric Facilities – Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines – Additional Notice Requirements Delegate Impallaria 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 773
Economic Matters
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0794 (SB0692) Public Service Commission - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines - Location Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0961 /CH0176 Rural Broadband Communication Services Delegate Mautz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 176
Economic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1120 Land Use - Zoning - Agritourism Activities Delegate Rey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1168 (SB1125) Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Surface Mining Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1229 /CH0066 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Use of Land – Signs and Outdoor Advertising Displays Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 66
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1230 /CH0170 (SB0960/CH0171) Maryland Historical Trust - Property Subject to Historic Preservation Easement - Application for Change or Alteration Delegate Buckel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1345 Sewerage Systems - Residential Major Subdivisions in Tier III and Tier IV Areas Delegate Rose 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1351 /CH0492 Agriculture – Easements – Special Occasion Events Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1736 (SB1140/CH0623) Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Lot Release Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0360 (HB0609/CH0089) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Senators 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB0571 /CH0644 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Use of Land - Signs and Outdoor Advertising Displays Senator Bates 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 644
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0692 (HB0794) Public Service Commission - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines - Location Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0885 /CH0622 Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Condemnation of Land Under Easement Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 622
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0960 /CH0171 (HB1230/CH0170) Maryland Historical Trust - Property Subject to Historic Preservation Easement - Application for Change or Alteration Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0997 Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB1125 (HB1168) Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Surface Mining Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Rules
SB1140 /CH0623 (HB1736) Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Definition of Child Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 623
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1235 Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements - Credit Transfer Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM