Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Easements

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0017 /CH0026 (SB0244/CH0027)
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Valuation of Easement
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0645 (SB0461/CH0285)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0925 (SB0864)
Title
Department of Natural Resources - Acquisition of Land, Water, or Easements in Garrett and Allegany Counties - Subdivision of Property
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1014 (SB0578)
Title
Electricity – Considerations for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity and Overhead Transmission Lines
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1128
Title
Environment – Water Quality Certifications – Requests (Water Quality Certification Improvement Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1479 /CH0480
Title
Calvert County - Subdivision Plats - Stormwater Management Easements
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0244 /CH0027 (HB0017/CH0026)
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Valuation of Easement
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0461 /CH0285 (HB0645)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0570 /CH0566
Title
Real Property - Notice of Easements, Covenants, Restrictions, and Conditions - Recordation
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0578 (HB1014)
Title
Electricity - Considerations for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity and Overhead Transmission Lines
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0864 (HB0925)
Title
Department of Natural Resources - Acquisition of Land, Water, or Easements in Garrett and Allegany Counties - Subdivision of Property
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0017 /CH0026 (SB0244/CH0027) Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Valuation of Easement Delegate Arentz 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26
Environment and Transportation
1/29/2020 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0645 (SB0461/CH0285) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0925 (SB0864) Department of Natural Resources - Acquisition of Land, Water, or Easements in Garrett and Allegany Counties - Subdivision of Property Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1014 (SB0578) Electricity – Considerations for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity and Overhead Transmission Lines Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1128 Environment – Water Quality Certifications – Requests (Water Quality Certification Improvement Act) Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1479 /CH0480 Calvert County - Subdivision Plats - Stormwater Management Easements Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 480
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0244 /CH0027 (HB0017/CH0026) Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Valuation of Easement Senator Gallion 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 27
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0461 /CH0285 (HB0645) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 285
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0570 /CH0566 Real Property - Notice of Easements, Covenants, Restrictions, and Conditions - Recordation Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 566
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2020 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0578 (HB1014) Electricity - Considerations for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity and Overhead Transmission Lines Harford County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0864 (HB0925) Department of Natural Resources - Acquisition of Land, Water, or Easements in Garrett and Allegany Counties - Subdivision of Property Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:24 PM