Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Eastern Shore

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0999 /CH0606 (SB0540)
Title
Member-Regulated Cooperatives - Establishment (Rural Broadband for the Eastern Shore Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1500 /CH0481
Title
Special Taxing Districts - Eastern Shore Code Counties - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0352 /CH0318
Title
Somerset County – Property Tax Exemption for Manufacturing Property – Eastern Shore Forest Products, Inc.
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0540 (HB0999/CH0606)
Title
Member-Regulated Cooperatives - Establishment (Rural Broadband for the Eastern Shore Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1069
Title
Transportation - Eastern Shore Counties - Construction of Toll Roads
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0999 /CH0606 (SB0540) Member-Regulated Cooperatives - Establishment (Rural Broadband for the Eastern Shore Act of 2020) Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 606
Economic Matters
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1500 /CH0481 Special Taxing Districts - Eastern Shore Code Counties - Authorization Delegate Arentz 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 481
Ways and Means
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0352 /CH0318 Somerset County – Property Tax Exemption for Manufacturing Property – Eastern Shore Forest Products, Inc. Senator Carozza 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 318
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0540 (HB0999/CH0606) Member-Regulated Cooperatives - Establishment (Rural Broadband for the Eastern Shore Act of 2020) Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1069 Transportation - Eastern Shore Counties - Construction of Toll Roads Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:16 PM