Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Elder Abuse and Neglect

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0375 (SB0177)
Title
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Increased Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0379
Title
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0382 (SB0182)
Title
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0723 /CH0421
Title
Money Transmission - Protection From Financial Abuse, Financial Exploitation, and Fraud - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0724 (SB0435)
Title
Civil Actions - Damages for Crimes Against Vulnerable or Elderly Adults - Standing
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0810
Title
Crimes - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults - Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0816 (SB0261)
Title
Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1371
Title
Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1377
Title
Office of Health Care Quality - Abuser Registry Workgroup
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1511
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Adult Dependent Care Providers - Maryland Background Check Program
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0177 (HB0375)
Title
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Increased Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0182 (HB0382)
Title
Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial Release
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0261 (HB0816)
Title
Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0435 (HB0724)
Title
Civil Actions - Damages for Crimes Against Vulnerable or Elderly Adults - Standing
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0681
Title
Department of Human Resources - Contracts for Legal Services
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1093
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Legal Services Delivery Organization to Provide State-Mandated Legal Services
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0375 (SB0177) Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Increased Penalties Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0379 Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0382 (SB0182) Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial Release Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0723 /CH0421 Money Transmission - Protection From Financial Abuse, Financial Exploitation, and Fraud - Requirements Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0724 (SB0435) Civil Actions - Damages for Crimes Against Vulnerable or Elderly Adults - Standing Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0810 Crimes - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults - Breach of Fiduciary Duty Delegate Lee 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0816 (SB0261) Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal Delegate Hubbard 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1371 Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1377 Office of Health Care Quality - Abuser Registry Workgroup Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1511 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Adult Dependent Care Providers - Maryland Background Check Program Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2014 - 12:30 PM
SB0177 (HB0375) Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Increased Penalties Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0182 (HB0382) Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial Release Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0261 (HB0816) Requirements for Filial Support - Repeal Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0435 (HB0724) Civil Actions - Damages for Crimes Against Vulnerable or Elderly Adults - Standing Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0681 Department of Human Resources - Contracts for Legal Services Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1093 State Finance and Procurement - Legal Services Delivery Organization to Provide State-Mandated Legal Services Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM