Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Elder Abuse and Neglect -see also- Vulnerable Adults

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0803 (SB0900)
Title
Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of Abuse
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0047 /CH0207
Title
Reporting Abuse to the Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program and the Office of Health Care Quality
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0680 /CH0605
Title
Adult Protective Services Investigations - Completion Time
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0900 (HB0803)
Title
Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of Abuse
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0803 (SB0900) Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of Abuse Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0047 /CH0207 Reporting Abuse to the Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program and the Office of Health Care Quality Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Finance
1/19/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0680 /CH0605 Adult Protective Services Investigations - Completion Time Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0900 (HB0803) Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of Abuse Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM