Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Elections Supervisors

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0049
Title
Election Law - Petitions - Confidentiality
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0113 (SB0173)
Title
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Selection of Members - Straw Ballot
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0196 /CH0198 (SB0171/CH0197)
Title
Election Law - Special Elections - Voting by Mail
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0217 (SB0373)
Title
Early Voting Access Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0224 /CH0158 (SB0279/CH0157)
Title
Election Law - Improving Access to Voting
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0242 (SB0519)
Title
Election Law - Registration and Voting at Early Voting Centers
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0427
Title
Election Law - Absentee Ballots - Timeliness
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0592
Title
Election Law - Reporting of Precinct Results
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0703
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0729 (SB0367)
Title
Election Law - Petitions - Confidentiality
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0974
Title
Election Law - Subsequent Election Absentee Ballot List
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1234
Title
Election of Circuit Court Judges - Random Ordering of Names
Sponsor
Delegate Frank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1427
Title
State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0108
Title
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Selection of Members - Straw Ballot
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0171 /CH0197 (HB0196/CH0198)
Title
Election Law - Special Elections - Voting by Mail
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0173 (HB0113)
Title
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Selection of Members - Straw Ballot
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0279 /CH0157 (HB0224/CH0158)
Title
Election Law - Improving Access to Voting
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0304 /CH0223
Title
Calvert County - Election Judges - Compensation
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0309
Title
Election Law - Local Board Employees - Qualifications
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0367 (HB0729)
Title
Election Law - Petitions - Confidentiality
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0373 (HB0217)
Title
Early Voting Access Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0519 (HB0242)
Title
Election Law - Registration and Voting at Early Voting Centers
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0840 /CH0567
Title
Voting - Notice of Election by Specimen Ballot
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0901
Title
Election Law - Elections by Mail
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0993
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of Members
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0049 Election Law - Petitions - Confidentiality Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0113 (SB0173) Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Selection of Members - Straw Ballot Delegate Kipke 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0196 /CH0198 (SB0171/CH0197) Election Law - Special Elections - Voting by Mail Delegate Cardin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Ways and Means
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0217 (SB0373) Early Voting Access Act of 2013 Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0224 /CH0158 (SB0279/CH0157) Election Law - Improving Access to Voting Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0242 (SB0519) Election Law - Registration and Voting at Early Voting Centers Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0427 Election Law - Absentee Ballots - Timeliness Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0592 Election Law - Reporting of Precinct Results Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0703 Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of Members Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0729 (SB0367) Election Law - Petitions - Confidentiality Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0974 Election Law - Subsequent Election Absentee Ballot List Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1234 Election of Circuit Court Judges - Random Ordering of Names Delegate Frank 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1427 State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality Program Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0108 Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Selection of Members - Straw Ballot Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2013 - 1:30 PM
SB0171 /CH0197 (HB0196/CH0198) Election Law - Special Elections - Voting by Mail Senator Forehand 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0173 (HB0113) Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Selection of Members - Straw Ballot Anne Arundel County Senators 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2013 - 1:30 PM
SB0279 /CH0157 (HB0224/CH0158) Election Law - Improving Access to Voting President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0304 /CH0223 Calvert County - Election Judges - Compensation Senator Miller 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0309 Election Law - Local Board Employees - Qualifications Senator Getty 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0367 (HB0729) Election Law - Petitions - Confidentiality Senator Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0373 (HB0217) Early Voting Access Act of 2013 Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0519 (HB0242) Election Law - Registration and Voting at Early Voting Centers Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0840 /CH0567 Voting - Notice of Election by Specimen Ballot Senator Stone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0901 Election Law - Elections by Mail Senator Dyson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0993 Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of Members Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM