Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Elections Supervisors

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0226 (SB0311)
Title
Election Law - Casting of Ballot by Mail - Public Communications
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0284 /CH0082
Title
Election Law - Local Petitions - Advance Determination of Sufficiency of Local Law or Charter Amendment Summary
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0864 /CH0109 (SB0020)
Title
Kent County - Board of Elections - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1018
Title
Election Law - Early Voting Centers and Polling Places - Waiting Times to Vote
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1064
Title
Election Law - Audits of Election Results
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1186
Title
Domestic Violence - Confidentiality Program - Name of Victim
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0020 (HB0864/CH0109)
Title
Kent County - Board of Elections - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0193
Title
Election Law - Local Petitions - Advance Determination of Sufficiency of Local Law or Charter Amendment Summary
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0311 (HB0226)
Title
Election Law - Casting of Ballot by Mail - Public Communications
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0226 (SB0311) Election Law - Casting of Ballot by Mail - Public Communications Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0284 /CH0082 Election Law - Local Petitions - Advance Determination of Sufficiency of Local Law or Charter Amendment Summary Delegate Flanagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0864 /CH0109 (SB0020) Kent County - Board of Elections - Membership Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1018 Election Law - Early Voting Centers and Polling Places - Waiting Times to Vote Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1064 Election Law - Audits of Election Results Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1186 Domestic Violence - Confidentiality Program - Name of Victim Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0020 (HB0864/CH0109) Kent County - Board of Elections - Membership Senator Hershey 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0193 Election Law - Local Petitions - Advance Determination of Sufficiency of Local Law or Charter Amendment Summary Senator Bates 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0311 (HB0226) Election Law - Casting of Ballot by Mail - Public Communications Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM